Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Dowd

Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1970 Born
7 Dec 200131.2Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
11 Jul 201140.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
11 Jul 201140.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Treba
10 Sep 201140.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Treba
22 Oct 202050.1AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas Dowd
Bishop Thomas Dowd (born ) Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLachine
Ordained BishopMarie Reine du Monde, Cathedral, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2011
  • ob: CB, 15 Jul 2011
  • c2+: CB, 8 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast