Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Mancini

Archbishop Emeritus of Halifax-Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1945 Born
23 May 197024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
18 Feb 199953.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
18 Feb 199953.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Natchitoches
25 Mar 199953.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Natchitoches
18 Oct 200761.8AppointedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
18 Oct 200761.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
29 Nov 200762.0InstalledArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
26 Sep 200963.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
22 Oct 200963.9AppointedArchbishop of Halifax-Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
21 Nov 200963.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
27 Nov 202075.0RetiredArchbishop of Halifax-Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Anthony Mancini
Archbishop Anthony Mancini (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Halifax-Yarmouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMignano Monte Lungo, Italy
Ordained BishopMarie-Reine-du-Monde et Saint-Jacques, Cathedral Basilica, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Halifax-Yarmouth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2007
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,492
  • ab/hali: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2012, Page 288
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 27 Nov 2020

Quantcast