Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Thomas Ruggieri

Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1968 Born
23 Apr 199426.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
24 Jun 199527.4Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
13 Feb 202456.0AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
7 May 202456.3Ordained BishopBishop of Portland, Maine, USA

MicroData Summary
James Thomas Ruggieri
Bishop James Thomas Ruggieri
(born )
Bishop of Portland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProvidence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island
Ordained DeaconSaint Mary Seminary and University, Chapel, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained PriestSaints Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Providence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Portland, Diocese of Portland, Maine

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Portland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2024
  • ob: CB, 13 Feb 2024
  • c2+: CB, 22 Mar 2024
  • od/c01: CB, 12 Apr 2024
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 260, Number 21,482

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 30 Apr 2025