Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Teodoro Cardenal Fernández

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1916Born
25 May 194124.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 196953.1AppointedBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
25 Jan 197053.2Ordained BishopBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
19 Oct 198366.9AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
30 Oct 199276.0RetiredArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
17 Oct 200689.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Cardenal Fernández (VIAF: 87882789)
Archbishop Teodoro Cardenal Fernández (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlacePesquera de Duero
Ordained BishopCathedral, Burgo de Osma, Diocese of Osma-Soria

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast