Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Plácido Rodríguez, C.M.F.

Bishop Emeritus of Lubbock, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1940 Born
8 Sep 196019.9ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
23 May 196827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
18 Oct 198343.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
18 Oct 198343.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Fuerteventura
13 Dec 198343.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fuerteventura
5 Apr 199453.4AppointedBishop of Lubbock, Texas, USA
1 Jun 199453.6InstalledBishop of Lubbock, Texas, USA
27 Sep 201675.9RetiredBishop of Lubbock, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Plácido Rodríguez
Bishop Plácido Rodríguez C.M.F. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lubbock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCelaya, México
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lubbock.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,860

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast