Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hildebrando Mendes Costa

Bishop Emeritus of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1926 Born
2 Dec 195125.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 198154.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
15 Mar 198154.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
24 May 198154.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
25 Mar 198659.7AppointedBishop of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil
30 Apr 200376.8RetiredBishop of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Hildebrando Mendes Costa
Bishop Hildebrando Mendes Costa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Estância

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarra do Itiúba
Ordained BishopAparecida, Archdiocese of Aparecida, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Estância.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,841

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast