Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petar Palić

Bishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1972 Born
1 Jun 199623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
9 Mar 201845.6AppointedBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
30 Apr 201845.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
11 Jul 202048.0AppointedBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
14 Sep 202048.1InstalledBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Petar Palić (VIAF: 305556023)
Bishop Petar Palić (born ) Bishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePriština
Ordained BishopSveti Stjepan I Papa, Cathedral, Hvar, Diocese of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,773
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast