Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ivan Štironja

Bishop-Elect of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1960 Born
29 Jun 198626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
22 Dec 202060.6AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
7 Apr 202160.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Ivan Štironja
Father Ivan Štironja (born ) Bishop-Elect of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePješivac, Diocese of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
Ordained PriestCathedral, Mostar, Diocese of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kotor, Diocese of Kotor (Cattaro)

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Kotor (Cattaro).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2020
  • c1: CB, 22 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Feb 2021

Quantcast