Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Jesús Orozco Mengibar

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1970 Born
9 Jul 199525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Spain
30 Oct 201848.5AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
22 Dec 201848.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Jesús Orozco Mengibar
Bishop Francisco Jesús Orozco Mengibar (born ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca de Córdoba, Diocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guadix, Diocese of Guadix

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guadix.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2018
  • ob/c1: CB, 30 Oct 2018
  • c2+: CB, 17 Dec 2018
  • c3: CB, 22 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,957

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast