Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Nnachi Okoro

Bishop Emeritus of Abakaliki, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1940 Born
15 Aug 196524.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ogoja, Nigeria
19 Dec 196525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ogoja, Nigeria
27 Jun 197736.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Abakaliki, Nigeria
27 Jun 197736.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Catabum Castra
27 Nov 197737.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catabum Castra
19 Feb 198342.2AppointedBishop of Abakaliki, Nigeria
6 Jul 202180.6RetiredBishop of Abakaliki, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Michael Nnachi Okoro
Bishop Michael Nnachi Okoro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Abakaliki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdiabo
Ordained PriestAfikpo
Ordained BishopAbakaliki, Diocese of Abakaliki

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Abakaliki.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,080
  • od/c1: CB, 12 Jun 2021
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Jul 2021

Quantcast