Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles Bélisle

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Uccula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1923Born
2 Feb 195026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
11 May 197753.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
11 May 197753.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Uccula
21 Jun 197753.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uccula
19 Aug 199369.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
12 Apr 199672.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gilles Bélisle
Bishop Gilles Bélisle (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ottawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClarence Creek, Archdiocese of Ottawa, Ontario
Ordained BishopNotre Dame, Cathedral, Ottawa, Archdiocese of Ottawa, Ontario
Death PlaceOrléans

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,869

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast