Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ildefonso Obama Obono

Archbishop Emeritus of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1938 Born
29 Jun 196426.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Oct 198244.4AppointedBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea
6 Jan 198344.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea
9 Jul 199153.1AppointedArchbishop of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea
11 Feb 201576.7RetiredArchbishop of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Ildefonso Obama Obono
Archbishop Ildefonso Obama Obono (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Malabo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKogo
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Malabo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast