Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Thanh Thai Nguyen

Auxiliary Bishop of Orange in California, USA

Titular Bishop of Acalissus

Titular See: (Tôma Nguyęn Thái Thŕnh)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1953 Born
1984²30.7ProfessedMember of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
19 Sep 199037.4Solemn VowsMember of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
11 May 199138.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
29 Jun 199946.2IncardinatedPriest of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
6 Oct 201764.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Orange in California, USA
6 Oct 201764.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Acalissus
19 Dec 201764.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acalissus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Thanh Thai Nguyen
Bishop Thomas Thanh Thai Nguyen (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Orange in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNha Trang
Ordained PriestHartford, Archdiocese of Hartford, Connecticut
Ordained BishopSt. Columban, Church, Garden Grove, Diocese of Orange in California

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orange in California.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2017
  • ob: CB, 10 Oct 2017
  • c23: CB, 22 Oct 2017
  • c4/inca/c1l: CB, 10 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,620

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast