Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Anthony Rosazza

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

Titular Bishop of Oppidum Novum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1935 Born
17 Dec 196025.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
29 Jun 196126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
28 Feb 197843.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
28 Feb 197843.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Oppidum Novum
24 Jun 197843.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oppidum Novum
30 Jun 201075.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Anthony Rosazza
Bishop Peter Anthony Rosazza (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hartford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Haven
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopHartford, Archdiocese of Hartford, Connecticut

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Hartford.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,147
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast