Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
1 Jan 1960 | Born | ||
22 Aug 1990 | 30.6 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers) |
17 Jan 2024 | 64.0 | Appointed | Bishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.) |
(WikiData: Q124308551)
Father
Emmanuel
Ngona Ngotsi
M. Afr.
(born )
Bishop-Elect
of Wamba
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Bambu-Mines, Diocese of Bunia |
Ordained Priest | Fataki, Diocese of Bunia |
Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Wamba.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠