Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kisangani

Archidioecesis Kisanganiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Marcel Utembi Tapa, Archbishop
  • Lťonard Ndjadi Ndjate, M.C.C.I., Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Stanley Falls
3 August 1904ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Belgian Congo {Congo Belga} o Indipendente Prefecture Apostolic of Stanley Falls (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley Falls
10 March 1908ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Stanley Falls Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley Falls
27 June 1922Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Stanley Falls
Vicariate Apostolic of Uganda (West of Lake Albert attached to Belgian government)
Prefecture Apostolic of Lac Albert (erected)
9 April 1934Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Stanley Falls (Beni and Lubero) Mission "Sui Iuris" of Beni nel Congo Belga {Belgian Congo} (erected)
10 March 1949Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Stanley Falls Vicariate Apostolic of Wamba (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville
10 March 1949Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Stanley Falls Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville
14 June 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Basankusu
Vicariate Apostolic of Coquilhatville
Vicariate Apostolic of Lisala
Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville
Prefecture Apostolic of Isangi (erected)
10 January 1952Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Baudouinville (Boundaries adjusted)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kivu (Boundaries adjusted)
Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville (Boundaries adjusted)
23 April 1956Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kongolo (Rimbombo, and parts of KongoloŽnsi, Kasongo, and Kindu)
Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville (Parts of Lubutu and Shabunda)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kindu (erected)
28 November 1958Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville (North of the river Linda, from eastern limits to the 26th degree longitude) Vicariate Apostolic of Wamba
Archdiocese of Stanley-ville
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville Archdiocese of Stanley-ville
Archdiocese of Kisangani
30 May 1966Name ChangedArchdiocese of Stanley-ville Archdiocese of Kisangani

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville
1950132,666442,75030.0%690961,381179719ap1951
Archdiocese of Stanley-ville
Archdiocese of Kisangani
1970230,000557,30041.3%938474,893645124ap1971
1980294,000800,00036.8%847555,345756832ap1981
1990458,881970,00047.3%2363865,33512511840ap1991
1997575,0201,265,00045.5%3457916,318949939ap2002
2013805,0001,677,00048.0%62511137,12322038842ap2014
2016975,0001,841,00053.0%63411049,37517715632ap2017
2019951,2001,962,20048.5%58471059,05913816732ap2020
2021959,3402,085,66046.0%606015,9899917332ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 41, Page 437, and Page 438
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 435, and Page 466
  • Archdiocese of Stanley-ville
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 52, Page 372, to Page 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024