Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Kumuondala Mbimba

Deceased

Archbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1941Born
21 Sep 196928.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 198039.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Nov 198039.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Simidicca
7 Jun 198140.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simidicca
18 Mar 198241.2AppointedBishop of Bokungu-Ikela, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Oct 199150.7AppointedArchbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Mar 201675.1DiedArchbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary
Joseph Kumuondala Mbimba
Archbishop Joseph Kumuondala Mbimba
(born 1941, died )
Archbishop of Mbandaka-Bikoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMokombe
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Bokungu, Diocese of Bokungu-Ikela

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 6 Mar 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,481

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025