Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Neylon

Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Plestia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1958 Born
31 May 198224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 202163.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 202163.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Plestia
3 Sep 202163.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plestia

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Neylon
Bishop Thomas Joseph Neylon (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarrington, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained PriestHeaton Park, Manchester, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Liverpool.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2021
  • ob/c12: CB, 6 Jul 2021
  • c3+: CB, 3 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Sep 2021

Quantcast