Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Francisco Nepomuceno, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cotabato, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Castellum Tingitii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1925Born
23 May 195327.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
11 Jul 196944.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cotabato, Philippines
11 Jul 196944.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Tingitii
31 Aug 196944.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Tingitii
11 Dec 197954.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Cotabato, Philippines
14 Feb 199771.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cotabato, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Antonino Francisco Nepomuceno
Bishop Antonino Francisco Nepomuceno O.M.I. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cotabato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBustos
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Cotabato, Territorial Prelature of Cotabato

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 23 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 253
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast