Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bienvenido Mercado Lopez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Muteci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1924Born
29 Mar 195228.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 196642.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
3 Dec 196642.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Muteci
22 Jan 196742.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muteci
27 Apr 199571.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Bienvenido Mercado Lopez
Bishop Bienvenido Mercado Lopez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBustos
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • mn: CB, 16 Aug 2015
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast