Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gérard Mongeau, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cotabato, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1900Born
14 Jun 192424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
27 Mar 195151.1AppointedPrelate of Cotabato, Philippines
27 Mar 195151.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
29 Jun 195151.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diana
12 Jun 197676.3AppointedBishop of Cotabato, Philippines
5 Nov 197979.7AppointedArchbishop of Cotabato, Philippines
14 Mar 198080.1RetiredArchbishop of Cotabato, Philippines
29 Oct 199494.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cotabato, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Gérard Mongeau (VIAF: 78002209)
Archbishop Gérard Mongeau O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cotabato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceL`Épiphanie, Canada
Ordained BishopCotabato, Territorial Prelature of Cotabato

  • a priest for 70.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 65
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 208
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast