Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph Myers

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1941Born
17 Dec 196625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Peoria, Illinois, USA
7 Jul 198745.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
3 Sep 198746.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
23 Jan 199048.4SucceededBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
24 Jul 200159.9AppointedArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
9 Oct 200160.2InstalledArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
9 Oct 200160.2AppointedSuperior of Turks and Caicos, Antilles
7 Nov 201675.2RetiredArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
7 Nov 201675.2RetiredSuperior of Turks and Caicos, Antilles
24 Sep 202079.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Myers (VIAF: 18795375)
Archbishop John Joseph Myers (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOttawa, IL
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Peoria, Diocese of Peoria, Illinois
Death PlaceOttawa, IL
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Sepulchre, St. Mary, Cathedral, Peoria, Diocese of Peoria, Illinois

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,153
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast