Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Muñoz Curiel, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Titular Bishop of Tucci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1958 Born
7 Aug 198325.4EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Aug 198426.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
20 Sep 198830.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jul 199335.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 201859.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
2 Feb 201859.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tucci
21 Apr 201860.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tucci

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Muñoz Curiel
Bishop Juan Manuel Muñoz Curiel O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopSantuario de los Mártires, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2018
  • prof: CB, 2 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Feb 2018
  • c34: CB, 21 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,764

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast