Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Próspero María Alarcón y Sánchez de la Barquera

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1827Born
11 Mar 185426.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of México, Federal District
3 Mar 185527.5Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
17 Dec 189164.3AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
7 Feb 189264.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
30 Mar 190880.6DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Próspero María Alarcón y Sánchez de la Barquera (VIAF: 63682279)
Archbishop Próspero María Alarcón y Sánchez de la Barquera (born , died ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLerma, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 4
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 509, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 658, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 659

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast