Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Torres Romero

Deceased

Bishop of Toluca, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1922Born
15 Aug 194523.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 196745.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
30 Dec 196745.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Byzacena
25 Feb 196845.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Byzacena
4 Jan 197552.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Aguascalientes, México
197653.3ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Aguascalientes, México
26 Jul 198057.9AppointedBishop of Toluca, México, México
29 Sep 198058.1InstalledBishop of Toluca, México, México
15 Oct 199573.1DiedBishop of Toluca, México, México

MicroData Summary
Alfredo Torres Romero
Bishop Alfredo Torres Romero
(born , died )
Bishop of Toluca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuruàndiro, Archdiocese of Michoacán
Ordained BishopN.-D. de l'Assomption, Cathedral, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 96, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025