Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Andrés Mauro Muldoon, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Juticalpa, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1938 Born
11 Jun 196627.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1 Feb 198344.4AppointedPrelate of Inmaculada Concepción de la B.V.M. en Olancho, Honduras
24 Jul 198445.9AppointedPrelate of Inmaculada Concepción de la B.V.M. en Olancho, Honduras
8 Oct 198446.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Inmaculada Concepción de la B.V.M. en Olancho, Honduras
31 Oct 198749.2AppointedBishop of Juticalpa, Honduras
2 Feb 201273.4ResignedBishop of Juticalpa, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Tomás Andrés Mauro Muldoon
Bishop Tomás Andrés Mauro Muldoon O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Juticalpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Juticalpa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast