Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Molinari

Archbishop Emeritus of L’Aquila, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1938 Born
29 Jun 196224.4Ordained PriestPriest of L’Aquila, Italy
30 Sep 198951.7AppointedBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
8 Dec 198951.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
6 Jan 199051.9InstalledBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
16 Mar 199658.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
6 Jun 199860.4SucceededArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
8 Jun 201375.4RetiredArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Molinari
Archbishop Giuseppe Molinari (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of L’Aquila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScoppito, Archdiocese of L’Aquila
Ordained PriestSan Giacomo Apostolo, Church, Scoppito, Archdiocese of L’Aquila
Ordained BishopCathedral, L’Aquila, Archdiocese of L’Aquila

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of L’Aquila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,673
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2013
  • i/loc: AM, 25 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast