Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni D’Ercole, F.D.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1947 Born
5 Oct 197427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of Divine Providence
14 Nov 200962.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of L’Aquila, Italy
14 Nov 200962.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dusa
12 Dec 200962.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dusa
12 Apr 201466.5AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
10 May 201466.5InstalledBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
29 Oct 202073.0ResignedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni D’Ercole
Bishop Giovanni D’Ercole F.D.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Piceno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorino
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ascoli Piceno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,327
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2014
  • i: CB, 14 Apr 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast