Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cleto Bellucci

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Fermo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1921Born
27 Jan 194624.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 196947.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Taranto, Italy
15 Mar 196947.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Melzi
14 May 196948.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Melzi
22 Jul 197049.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Fermo, Italy
27 Sep 197049.4InstalledApostolic Administrator of Fermo, Italy
7 Jul 197352.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Fermo, Italy
21 Jun 197655.1SucceededArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
18 Jun 199776.1RetiredArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
7 Mar 201391.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cleto Bellucci
Archbishop Cleto Bellucci (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona, Archdiocese of Ancona e Numana
Ordained PriestPontificio Seminario Regionale, Chapel, Fano, Diocese of Fano
Ordained BishopSt-Justin, Cathedral, Chieti, Archdiocese of Chieti
Death PlaceFermo, Archdiocese of Fermo
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 7 Mar 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Number 63
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 386
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 98, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1/aadm: AM, 17 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Jan 2021

Quantcast