Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Toso, S.D.B.

Bishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1950 Born
16 Aug 196717.1Solemn VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Jul 197828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Oct 200959.3AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Justice and Peace
22 Oct 200959.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisarcio
12 Dec 200959.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisarcio
19 Jan 201564.5AppointedBishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy
15 Mar 201564.7InstalledBishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Toso
Bishop Mario Toso S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Faenza-Modigliana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMogliano Veneto, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Faenza-Modigliana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,325
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2015
  • i: CB, 24 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast