Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Ma Yinglin

Archbishop of Kunming [Kunming], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1965 Born
Sep 1989³24.3Ordained PriestPriest
2006²40.6SelectedBishop of Kunming [Kunming], China
30 Apr 200641.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kunming [Kunming], China
22 Sep 201853.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Kunming [Kunming], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ma Yinglin
Archbishop Joseph Ma Yinglin (born ) Archbishop of Kunming [Kunming]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kunming, Archdiocese of Kunming [Kunming]

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kunming [Kunming].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Sep 2018
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast