Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kunming [Kunming]

Archidioecesis Coenmimensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Ma Yinglin, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 150,000 (57,937 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Tuo-Tuwg Rd., Kunming, Yunnan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of YŁnnan
28 August 1840ErectedVicariate Apostolic of YŁnnan (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of YŁnnanfu
8 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of YŁnnan Vicariate Apostolic of YŁnnanfu
22 November 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of YŁnnanfu Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tali [Dali] (erected)
8 April 1935Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of YŁnnanfu Prefecture Apostolic of Zhaotong [Chaotung] (erected)
Archdiocese of Kunming [Kunming]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of YŁnnanfu Archdiocese of Kunming [Kunming]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Kunming [Kunming]
195010,0258,000,000.1%4064621794226ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast