Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Martin, S.M.

Coadjutor Archbishop of Wellington, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1967 Born
1985²17.6EnteredMember of Society of Mary
7 Jan 198820.6Perpetual VowsMember of Society of Mary
4 Sep 199326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
5 Dec 201750.5AppointedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
3 Mar 201850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
4 Mar 201850.8InstalledBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
1 Jan 202153.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Wellington, New Zealand

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Martin
Archbishop Paul Martin S.M. (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Wellington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHastings, Archdiocese of Wellington
Ordained BishopBoy's High School Auditorium, Christchurch, Diocese of Christchurch

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Wellington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2017
  • c2: CB, 26 Jan 2018
  • c34: CB, 2 Mar 2018
  • i: CB, 4 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,684
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 1 Jan 2021

Quantcast