Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Peter Thomas Cardinal McKeefry

Deceased

Archbishop of Wellington, New Zealand

Cardinal-Priest of Immacolata al Tiburtino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1899Born
3 Apr 192626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Auckland, New Zealand
12 Jun 194747.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
12 Jun 194747.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dercos (Dercus)
19 Oct 194748.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Dercos (Dercus)
9 May 195454.8SucceededArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
28 Apr 196969.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196969.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Immacolata al Tiburtino
18 Nov 197374.3DiedArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Peter Thomas McKeefry
Peter Thomas Cardinal McKeefry (born , died ) Archbishop of Wellington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGreymouth
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, Auckland, Diocese of Auckland

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 109
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,024
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,521

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast