Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Zurbano Marquez

Bishop Emeritus of Lucena, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1941 Born
6 Jun 196423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lucena, Philippines
15 Dec 198443.5AppointedBishop of Gumaca, Philippines
29 Jan 198543.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gumaca, Philippines
4 May 200260.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lucena, Philippines
13 Sep 200362.2SucceededBishop of Lucena, Philippines
29 Jul 201776.1RetiredBishop of Lucena, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Emilio Zurbano Marquez
Bishop Emilio Zurbano Marquez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lucena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLopez
Ordained BishopGumaca, Diocese of Gumaca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lucena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 29 Jul 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,726

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast