Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Oliveros

Deceased

Bishop of Malolos, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1946Born
28 Nov 197024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lucena, Philippines
198437.3IncardinatedPriest of Gumaca, Philippines
2 Feb 200053.3AppointedBishop of Boac, Philippines
20 Mar 200053.5Ordained BishopBishop of Boac, Philippines
14 May 200457.6AppointedBishop of Malolos, Philippines
5 Aug 200457.9InstalledBishop of Malolos, Philippines
11 May 201871.6DiedBishop of Malolos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Oliveros
Bishop José Francisco Oliveros (born , died ) Bishop of Malolos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuezon
Ordained BishopSan Diego de Alcala, Cathedral, Gumaca, Diocese of Gumaca
Death PlaceMalolos, Diocese of Malolos

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,720
  • d: CB, 11 May 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast