Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Malaysia

Malaesia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Wojciech Załuski, Apostolic Nuncio

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Elevated: 18 July 2011
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Malaysia
  • Mailing Address: 17 Jalan Ampang Hilir, 55000 Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
  • Telephone: (60-3)425.30.500
  • Fax: 426.50.500

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Malaysia and Brunei
7 December 1983SplitDelegation to Laos and Malaysia Delegation to Malaysia and Brunei
Delegation to Laos
Delegation to Malaysia
2 February 1998SplitDelegation to Malaysia and Brunei Delegation to Malaysia
Delegation to Brunei Darussalam
Nunciature to Malaysia
18 July 2011ElevatedDelegation to Malaysia Nunciature to Malaysia

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Delegation to Malaysia and Brunei
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 76, Page 262
  • Nunciature to Malaysia
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 103, Page 513, and Page 514
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 17 Jun 2024