Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Xavier Maurice Henri Malle, Comm. l'Emm.

Bishop of Gap (-Embrun), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1965 Born
23 Feb 199731.4ProfessedMember of Emmanuel Community
4 Jul 199933.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tours, France
2 Jul 200034.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tours, France
8 Apr 201751.5AppointedBishop of Gap (-Embrun), France
11 Jun 201751.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gap (-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for Xavier Maurice Henri Malle
Bishop Xavier Maurice Henri Malle Comm. l'Emm. (born ) Bishop of Gap (-Embrun)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValenciennes, Archdiocese of Cambrai
Ordained DeaconSaint-Gatien, Cathedral, Tours, Archdiocese of Tours
Ordained PriestSaint-Gatien, Cathedral, Tours, Archdiocese of Tours
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame-et-Saint-Arnoux, Cathedral, Gap, Diocese of Gap (-Embrun)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gap (-Embrun).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2017
  • ob: CB, 8 Apr 2017
  • c2+: CB, 1 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,446
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast