Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard-Nicolas Jean-Marie Aubertin, O. Cist.

Archbishop Emeritus of Tours, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1944 Born
21 May 197227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
7 Sep 198237.9ProfessedPriest of Order of Cistercians
4 Aug 199853.9AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
20 Sep 199854.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
23 Jun 200560.7AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
4 Sep 200560.9InstalledArchbishop of Tours, France
26 Oct 201975.1RetiredArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard-Nicolas Jean-Marie Aubertin
Archbishop Bernard-Nicolas Jean-Marie Aubertin O. Cist. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEpinal
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chartres, Diocese of Chartres

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tours.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,433
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast