Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alapati Lui Mata’eliga

Archbishop of Samoa-Apia, Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)

Superior of Tokelau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1953 Born
5 Jul 197724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Samoa and Tokelau, Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
16 Nov 200249.8AppointedArchbishop of Samoa-Apia, Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
3 Jan 200349.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Samoa-Apia, Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
22 Dec 201562.9AppointedSuperior of Tokelau, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Alapati Lui Mata’eliga
Archbishop Alapati Lui Mata’eliga (born ) Archbishop of Samoa-Apia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSataua
Ordained BishopTofa Mamao Centre, Leauvaa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Samoa-Apia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,298
  • ab: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2018, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast