Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Anthony White

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Archbishop of Sebana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1931Born
25 Feb 195624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
27 May 197846.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebana
27 May 197846.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
30 Jul 197846.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sebana
1 Mar 198351.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Ethiopia
14 Oct 198958.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to New Zealand
14 Oct 198958.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
14 Oct 198958.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Pacific Ocean
1 Dec 199261.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nauru, Pacific (Oceania)
199361.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to New Zealand
27 Apr 199664.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to New Zealand
27 Apr 199664.7ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
27 Apr 199664.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Nauru, Pacific (Oceania)
27 Apr 199664.7ResignedApostolic Delegate to Pacific Ocean
7 May 201785.7DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Thomas Anthony White
Archbishop Thomas Anthony White (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Fiji

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurrow, County Laois, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceGowran, County Kilkenny, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland
Buried Place (Original)Graveyard, St. Mary's, Cathedral, Kilkenny, County Kilkenny, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: CB, 8 May 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast