Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Edward Lynch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA

Titular Bishop of Satafi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1917Born
29 May 194326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
20 Oct 196952.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
20 Oct 196952.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Satafi
6 Jan 197052.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satafi
16 Apr 198568.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
25 May 200386.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for George Edward Lynch (VIAF: 31627216)
Bishop George Edward Lynch (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Raleigh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained PriestWashington, DC, Archdiocese of Baltimore-Washington, Maryland
Ordained BishopSt. Barnabas, Church, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast