Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Leo Ireton

Deceased

Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1882Born
20 Jun 190623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Aug 193552.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
3 Aug 193552.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyme
23 Oct 193553.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyme
6 Nov 193553.1InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
14 Apr 194562.5SucceededBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
27 Apr 195875.5DiedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Leo Ireton (VIAF: 250871219)
Bishop Peter Leo Ireton (born , died ) Bishop of Richmond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 82
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast