Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Georges-François-Xavier-Marie Cardinal Grente

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1872Born
29 Jun 189523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Coutances (-Avranches), France
30 Jan 191845.7AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
17 Apr 191845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
16 Mar 194370.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Le Mans, France
12 Jan 195380.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 195380.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
4 May 195986.9DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Georges-François-Xavier-Marie Grente (VIAF: 9882792)
Georges-François-Xavier-Marie Cardinal Grente (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlacePercy

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
  • a cardinal for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1918, Number 20
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 268, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 674, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast