Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Marie-Henri Rabine

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1922Born
27 Dec 194725.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 197350.9AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
24 Jun 197351.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
17 Mar 198663.7AppointedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
12 Dec 198866.4DiedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie-Henri Rabine
Archbishop Joseph-Marie-Henri Rabine (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Luce
Ordained BishopSt. Etienne, Cathedral, Cahors, Diocese of Cahors

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Jul 2021

Quantcast