Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Legal, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of São Miguel Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1931 Born
8 Dec 195927.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Mar 198048.2AppointedBishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
31 May 198048.4Ordained BishopBishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Apr 198553.3AppointedBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Mar 198957.2AppointedBishop of São Miguel Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Jan 200876.0RetiredBishop of São Miguel Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando Legal
Bishop Fernando Legal S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of São Miguel Paulista

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo
Ordained BishopMarie Auxiliatrice, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Miguel Paulista.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,909
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast