Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Lambert Filho, C.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sorocaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1929Born
10 Jan 195424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
4 Jan 197545.8AppointedBishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Mar 197546.0Ordained BishopBishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Nov 197950.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
20 Mar 198152.0SucceededBishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
29 Apr 199263.1AppointedArchbishop of Sorocaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
4 May 200576.1RetiredArchbishop of Sorocaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Feb 200777.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sorocaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Lambert Filho
Archbishop José Lambert Filho C.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sorocaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIgarapava
Ordained BishopSanta Cruz, Church, Rio Claro, Diocese of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,713
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Feb 2021

Quantcast