Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel Ferreira dos Santos, Júnior, M.S.C.

Bishop of Registro, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1967 Born
2 Feb 199123.8ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
23 Jan 199426.8Perpetual VowsMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
15 May 199427.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
7 Jan 199527.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
16 May 201851.1AppointedBishop of Registro, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Jul 201851.3Ordained BishopBishop of Registro, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Aug 201851.4InstalledBishop of Registro, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel Ferreira dos Santos, Júnior
Bishop Manoel Ferreira dos Santos, Júnior M.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Registro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItapetininga
Ordained PriestSarapuí
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Aparecida do Sul, Itapetininga, Diocese of Itapetininga, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Registro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 May 2018
  • perp/c01: CB, 16 May 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 May 2018
  • c34: CB, 25 May 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,822

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast