Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juozapas Matulaitis-Labukas

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Kaunas, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Mopta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1894Born
26 May 191824.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 196571.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kaunas, Lithuania
24 Nov 196571.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mopta
5 Dec 196571.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mopta
28 May 197985.3DiedApostolic Administrator of Kaunas, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Juozapas Matulaitis-Labukas
Bishop Juozapas Matulaitis-Labukas (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Kaunas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGreikonys

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 369, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 605, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast