Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Panevėžys

Dioecesis Panevezensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 4 April 1926
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Vilnius
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Lithuania
  • Square Kilometers: 13,000 (5,021 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://www.paneveziovyskupija.lt
  • Mailing Address: Panevezio Vyskupijos Kurija, Upytes 3, 35248 Panevezys, Lietuva
  • Telephone: (45)43.51.56

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
4 April 1926ErectedDiocese of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź) (Panevėžys, Šeduvys (except Badviliškis and Šiaulėnai with Polekelė), Pasvali, Birži, Kupiški, Bokiški, Zarasi, Baguvensis, Anykštensis (except for Kurkliai and Balninkai), UtÚnensis (...) Diocese of Panevėžys (erected)
24 December 1991Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Panevėžys (from Kaunas)
28 May 1997Territory LostArchdiocese of Kaunas
Diocese of Panevėžys
Diocese of Telšiai (-Klaipeda)
Diocese of Šiauliai (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950420,000450,00093.3%128ap1951
19701611610120ap1971
19801471470120ap1981
1990450,0001291293,488120ap1991
1999377,500443,50085.1%99993,81384113ap2000
2000377,000443,00085.1%93934,05371113ap2001
2001377,000443,00085.1%94944,01079113ap2002
2002480,000495,00097.0%85855,64779112ap2003
2003333,300405,50082.2%881893,744797111ap2004
2004333,300405,50082.2%911923,622595112ap2005
2013319,000388,00082.2%895943,393957111ap2014
2016314,000381,00082.4%844883,568862111ap2017
2019240,000293,00081.9%773803,000858111ap2020
2021234,000286,50081.7%825872,6891046111ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 18, Page 121, to Page 123
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 84, Page 273, and Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024